CARNFORTH AND DISTRICT TWINNING ASSOCIATION IN ASSOCIATION WITH SAILLY SUR LA LYS

Charity number: 1103426
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.77k £1.93k £5.93k £2.66k £6.63k
Total expenditure £5.45k £2.14k £4.96k £4.28k £4.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A