Financial history THE QUAY THEATRE AT SUDBURY

Charity number: 1099868
Charity reporting is up to date (99 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £323.02k £330.55k £353.34k £260.23k £321.37k
Total expenditure £319.67k £345.33k £352.16k £177.89k £241.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.00k
Income from government grants £44.35k £40.42k £42.26k £225.75k £123.18k