Accounts and annual returns J F COX BEQUEST

Charity number: 1102802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required