Financial history J F COX BEQUEST

Charity number: 1102802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.21k £9.40k £9.64k £8.62k £6.91k
Total expenditure £13.85k £31.33k £8.52k £101.41k £49.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A