THE PARSON CROSS COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT FORUM

Charity number: 1102741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £93.70k £68.65k £80.32k £125.84k £188.95k
Total expenditure £93.59k £67.39k £84.93k £89.42k £148.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £10.31k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.63k £1.73k £3.90k £5.68k £10.57k