Financial history ST MICHAELS PTA (HOUGHTON-LE-SPRING)

Charity number: 1099883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £332 £597 £3.92k £2.92k £1.83k
Total expenditure £352 £449 £963 £2.95k £702
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A