THE BUZZACOTT STUART DEFRIES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1100855
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £39.48k £32.80k £35.43k £10.81k £72.55k
Total expenditure £39.48k £29.54k £23.10k £27.68k £52.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A