TOGETHER IN WEST ESSEX

Charity number: 1105575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.64k £17.30k £13.70k £2.57k £544
Total expenditure £27.62k £11.68k £30.70k £7.83k £298
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A