Trustees THE QUEEN'S COLLEGE, OXFORD

Charity number: 1142553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

38 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr CLAIRE HARVEY CRAIG CBE Chair 02 August 2019
None on record
Professor Simon Leedham Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Dr Conor O'Brien Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Professor Jose Antonio Carillo De La Plata Trustee 06 May 2021
None on record
Professor Steven Kelly Trustee 13 November 2020
None on record
Professor Catharine Abell Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
Professor Jon Keating Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
Dr Robert Weatherup Trustee 23 October 2020
None on record
Dr DAVID MICHAEL PROUT Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER METCALF Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR SETH WHIDDEN Trustee 19 October 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD BRUCE PARKINSON Trustee 29 January 2015
None on record
Dr JENNIFER GUEST Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Dr LINDSAY ANN TURNBULL Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
Dr ANTHONY GARDNER Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
Dr PAOLO TAMMARO Trustee 03 December 2013
None on record
Dr DIRK MEYER Trustee 11 December 2012
None on record
Dr ANDREW TIMMS Trustee 23 June 2011
SEVENOAKS SCHOOL
Received: On time
PROFESSOR OWEN LEWIS REES Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr LUDOVIC PHALIPPOU Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR SIMON ALDRIDGE Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR JANE LANGDALE Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr REBECCA BEASLEY Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER NORBURY Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr KEYNA ANNE QUENBY O'REILLY Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr RICHARD BRUCE NICKERSON Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr CHARLIE LOUTH Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER O'CALLAGHAN Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR MARK BUCKLEY Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR PETER ALISTAIR ROBBINS Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr NICHOLAS JAMES OWEN Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr CHARLES CROWTHER Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR JONATHAN DOYE Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR ELIZABETH JANE CLAIRE MELLOR Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr PANAGIOTIS PAPAZOGLOU Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
Dr LAURA ROSEMARY LONSDALE Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
NICHOLAS CHARLES BAMFORTH Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR ROBERT TAYLOR Trustee 23 June 2011
None on record