Financial history ENGINEERS WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity number: 1101849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £657.52k £739.17k £843.65k £625.35k £645.75k
Total expenditure £734.51k £698.63k £609.22k £638.31k £592.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £608.44k £685.37k £779.16k £512.74k £497.33k
Income - Other trading activities £4.77k £575 £6.45k £84 £77.40k
Income - Charitable activities £43.27k £52.12k £56.96k £111.19k £63.48k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.04k £1.10k £1.08k £1.34k £2.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £726.58k £697.56k £607.55k £543.26k £464.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.93k £1.07k £1.67k £95.05k £127.73k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £20.19k £6.64k £57.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0