Trustees ENGINEERS WITHOUT BORDERS UK

Charity number: 1101849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jon Prichard Chair 05 January 2017
None on record
Adriana Vargas-Colwill Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Anna Claire Hein Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Akaraseth Puranasamriddhi Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Malithi Hennayake Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Zoe Clare Haseman Trustee 30 June 2021
None on record
Helena Mary Barrett Trustee 09 June 2018
None on record
Nick Tyler Trustee
ACTORS TOURING COMPANY (LONDON) LIMITED
Received: On time