SOCIETY OF THE SACRED MISSION

Charity number: 1101444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £620.58k £671.98k £2.92m £776.71k £473.86k
Total expenditure £825.18k £797.25k £904.73k £900.41k £661.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £253.36k £233.60k £1.93m £278.21k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £27.87k £18.21k £10.65k £45.80k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £64.86k £100.47k £570.95k £61.77k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £274.49k £260.08k £404.96k £361.74k N/A
Income - Other £0 £59.62k £0 £29.19k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £122.93k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £757.14k £744.27k £840.22k £702.92k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £52.98k £64.51k £108.21k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.30k £9.07k £9.40k £45.96k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £46.30k £26.07k £0 £43.32k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £34.83k £34.11k £43.31k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £89.28k N/A