SOCIETY OF THE SACRED MISSION

Charity number: 1101444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN WILLIAM HOGG Chair 24 September 2018
GOVERNORS OF THE CHARITY FOR RELIEF OF THE POOR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF CLERGYMEN (COMMONLY CALLED CLERGY SUPPORT TRUST) Received: On time
Mark Tomlinson Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Rev ROBERT JOHN STRETTON Trustee 09 June 2016 None on record
Rev Sheila Jane Bamber Trustee 18 December 2019 None on record
Rev EDWARD SYDNEY JOHN EWER Trustee 03 December 2013 None on record
Rev Robert Cooper Trustee 04 December 2020
CISWO CHARITABLE PROPERTY SERVICES TRUST Received: On time
THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION 2014 Received: On time