NORTHERN ACADEMY OF PERFORMING ARTS

Charity number: 1101368
Charity reporting is overdue by 1611 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 26/10/2013 08/11/2014
Total gross income £14.21k £25.08k £38.49k £20.57k £13.16k
Total expenditure £17.98k £20.60k £41.92k £17.10k £9.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A