IVORIAN DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity number: 1106968
Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 281 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 281 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 October 2020 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 11 July 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 June 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 29 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required