Financial history CLEETHORPES CHILDCARE

Charity number: 1102007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £410.75k £421.54k £395.00k £356.01k £293.20k
Total expenditure £413.62k £394.13k £388.02k £350.69k £330.39k
Income from government contracts £267.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £292.94k N/A