Friends of Calmore Infant School

Charity number: 1102133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.09k £4.55k £3.03k £3.33k £4.26k
Total expenditure £6.86k £1.89k £5.21k £5.14k £3.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A