Financial history CARRS LANE COUNSELLING CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1102628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.06k £50.45k £47.33k £65.56k £86.02k
Total expenditure £50.34k £48.21k £57.63k £55.26k £48.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A