Financial history THE LLOYD PARK CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1102134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.88m £3.15m £3.31m £3.53m £3.39m
Total expenditure £2.71m £3.07m £3.32m £3.51m £3.36m
Income from government contracts £972.19k £1.07m £1.66m £1.73m £1.75m
Income from government grants £0 £377.19k £11.03k £3.65k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £37.31k £3.85k £12.83k £8.47k £12.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.74m £2.97m £3.13m £3.37m £2.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.14k £608 £1.23k £2.37k £1.03k
Income - Other £99.03k £171.54k £171.00k £154.48k £717.90k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.69m £2.99m £3.25m £3.41m £3.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.63k £2.27k £2.36k £2.27k £956
Expenditure - Governance £23.68k £11.32k £11.96k £15.39k £15.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £16.31k £73.52k £72.10k £96.24k £126.08k