Trustees THE LLOYD PARK CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1102134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bisi Oyekanni Chair 01 November 2018
None on record
Charleen Gemma French Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
Sarah Proudfoot Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
Wendy Paula Fields Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record
Vivian Chan Trustee 08 December 2020
None on record
Kellie Louise Smith Trustee 08 December 2020
None on record
Marie Claire Kearney Trustee 08 December 2020
None on record
Jessica Doherty Trustee 08 December 2020
None on record
Bethany Winning Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Benjamin Johnson Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Dr Johanna Reades Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Laura Bellotti Trustee 02 November 2017
None on record
Max Jervis-Read Trustee 02 November 2017
None on record
Vivienne Barrett Trustee 24 January 2014
None on record
JAMES WRAGG Trustee 10 January 2013
None on record