LONDON INTERNATIONAL ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1104133
Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £152.70k £144.05k £125.22k £55.69k £31.91k
Total expenditure £142.93k £142.22k £114.32k £78.02k £31.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A