THE BATTERSEA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1103560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £6.95k £7.87k £5.43k £6.96k £8.32k
Total expenditure £5.20k £5.58k £5.35k £6.75k £7.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A