Financial history FRIENDS OF ST OSWALD'S

Charity number: 1103270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.19k £12.16k £2.25k £1.94k £1.54k
Total expenditure £0 £150 £9.34k £8.62k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A