FRIENDS OF SHIPLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 September 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 September 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 September 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 September 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 September 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 September 2017 Not Required