FRIENDS OF SHIPLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 18/09/2017 18/09/2018 18/09/2019 18/09/2020 18/09/2021
Total gross income £3.66k £7.97k £14.42k £8.73k £4.11k
Total expenditure £3.18k £5.91k £13.63k £8.14k £9.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A