ADAM KHAN MUSLIM TRUST

Charity number: 1101930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £8 £1.01k £2 £2 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £800 £0 £560
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A