Accounts and annual returns ST LEONARD'S SCHOOL PTA HEATH AND REACH

Charity number: 1101801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 August 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required