Financial history ST LEONARD'S SCHOOL PTA HEATH AND REACH

Charity number: 1101801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.07k £7.75k £12.11k £9.27k £8.17k
Total expenditure £6.06k £9.21k £10.36k £11.04k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A