Financial history ST JOSEPH'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102193
Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £11.44k £13.39k £10.10k £11.91k £10.55k
Total expenditure £6.14k £17.06k £9.10k £9.55k £11.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A