BARTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £123.02k £127.56k £204.88k £158.00k £286.00k
Total expenditure £145.73k £144.90k £195.56k £166.00k £189.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £7.41k £8.65k £45.00k