BARTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
laura Bernard Trustee 06 March 2021 None on record
craig morbey Trustee 06 March 2021 None on record
Catherine Cockram Trustee 02 January 2019 None on record
PIPPA GWILLIAM Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
CHRISTINE EMILY GERKIN Trustee None on record
Dr simon david howard heap Trustee 02 January 2015 None on record
Phil Patrick Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
Dr DANIEL FARLEY Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
RODNEY SHEPHERD Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record