FRIENDS OF BOWMANSGREEN

Charity number: 1101829
Charity reporting is overdue by 450 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 450 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 450 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 September 2018 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required