FRIENDS OF BOWMANSGREEN

Charity number: 1101829
Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018
Total gross income £22.62k £19.16k £8.12k £14.80k £13.78k
Total expenditure £22.65k £14.17k £7.82k £4.56k £20.73k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A £0 £0