Equality and Employment Law Centre

Charity number: 1101876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 29/03/2017 29/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £275.82k £200.94k £200.77k £211.48k £324.17k
Total expenditure £261.64k £196.30k £184.26k £304.28k £297.53k
Income from government contracts £121.78k £107.45k £129.13k £124.83k £20.19k
Income from government grants £0 £9.12k £10.15k £10.15k £9.12k