Financial history RURAL COMMUNITY RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1103206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £2.73k £5.63k £5.62k £2.68k £3.63k
Total expenditure £1.15k £2.38k £6.83k £5.64k £7.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A