Financial history THE ESFANDI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1103095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £62.56k £500.02k £817.56k £500.09k £500.09k
Total expenditure £353.33k £505.35k £766.23k £336.07k £824.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £500.00k £817.36k £500.00k £500.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £23 £203 £91 £89
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £505.35k £766.23k £336.07k £824.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.72k £2.92k £2.70k £2.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £501.63k £763.31k £333.37k £821.97k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0