Governing document Birmingham Newman University
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/02/2013 as amended on 03 Oct 2019 as amended on 02 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE CONDUCT OF A ROMAN CATHOLIC COLLEGE OF HIGHER EDUCATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, LEARNING AND RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.