Financial history WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1102882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £15.25k £11.71k £17.99k £54.65k £23.68k
Total expenditure £11.76k £7.46k £13.44k £28.26k £35.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A £6.00k £6.40k