Governing document WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2017 as amended on 23 Jul 2018 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO APPLY SUCH MONIES INVESTMENTS AND PROPERTY AS THE TRUSTEES RECEIVE IN THEIR CAPACITY AS TRUSTEES HEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE TRUST FUND") FOR THE RESEARCH PREPARATION AND WRITING OF THE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY OF WILTSHIRE PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH OBJECT IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.