Trustees WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST

Charity number: 1102882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Christopher Moss Chair 14 May 2018
BRADFORD ON AVON STATION FOOTBRIDGE CANOPY PROJECT
Received: On time
Tean Dallaway Trustee 28 October 2019
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Hugh Wright Trustee 10 June 2019
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
ROSEMARY ANITA ADDINGTON Trustee 14 May 2018
SPRINGFIELDS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Ian Leslie Thorn Trustee 23 October 2017
WILTSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Friends of The Marden Valley
Received: 37 days late
WILTSHIRE RURAL MUSIC SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Gillian Marjorie Alder Trustee 23 October 2017
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
MELISSA ANN BARNETT Trustee 27 February 2017
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Simon James Holden Trustee 25 February 2015
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
Chris Caswill Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
Stuart Wheeler Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record
John d'Arcy Trustee 02 January 2014
WILTSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST CIO
Recently registered
MICHAEL HODGES Trustee 02 January 2014
None on record
WILLIAM ARTHUR PERRY Trustee 14 November 2013
None on record
MIKE STONE Trustee
THE ROTARY CLUB OF CHIPPENHAM TRUST FUND
Received: On time