MYTIME ACTIVE

Charity number: 1102460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £32.63m £33.06m £31.53m £29.28m £27.55m
Total expenditure £31.72m £31.11m £31.58m £33.74m £30.53m
Income from government contracts £6.56m £6.04m £5.53m N/A £1.70m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £304.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £742.04k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.60m £1.65m £1.78m £1.66m £1.22m
Income - Charitable activities £30.95m £30.01m £29.26m £26.85m £26.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71.74k £80.17k £64.37k £28.32k £24.84k
Income - Other £0 £581.04k £423.07k £741.61k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.18m £29.57m £30.05m £32.24m £29.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £1.52m £1.49m £1.18m
Expenditure - Governance £26.30k £24.74k £34.84k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.54m £1.54m £0 £0 £0