Trustees MYTIME ACTIVE

Charity number: 1102460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Alexander Nickson Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Colin Douglas Trustee 24 November 2021
THE ALBERT KENNEDY TRUST
Received: On time
VOLUNTARY SERVICE ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Overdue by 478 days
Salena Mulhere Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Neve Rabbou Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Christopher Kettle Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Jack Shakespere Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Cllr. Joshua Matthew Philip King Cllr. Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Mytime Active Trustee 02 April 2020
None on record
CLLR ROBERT JOHN EVANS Trustee 26 September 2017
None on record
ISOBEL GOWAN Trustee 09 December 2014
THE PATCHWORKING GARDEN PROJECT
Received: On time