SOUTH WEST LONDON LAW CENTRES

Charity number: 1102433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.20m £1.63m £1.68m £1.60m £1.57m
Total expenditure £1.23m £1.69m £1.52m £1.54m £1.53m
Income from government contracts £691.93k £798.62k £797.20k £625.64k £667.77k
Income from government grants £103.53k £163.41k £129.03k £129.03k £129.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £202.18k £494.36k £178.09k £162.53k £178.87k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.00m £1.14m £1.50m £1.44m £1.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14 £20 £10 £108 £99
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.59m £1.44m £1.48m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.41k £100.67k £74.19k £60.64k £40.17k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.42k £8.68k £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0