Financial history SANDWELL LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1102431
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.46m £10.66m £10.99m £10.85m £7.53m
Total expenditure £11.03m £11.79m £11.23m £11.95m £9.01m
Income from government contracts £2.93m £2.99m £2.90m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.24m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £302.25k £318.05k £329.20k £421.78k £226.64k
Income - Charitable activities £10.14m £10.34m £10.65m £10.42m £7.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.27k £2.15k £13.08k £15.80k £1.47k
Income - Other £17.75k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.88m £11.63m £11.08m £11.81m £9.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £150.78k £155.82k £154.00k £140.20k £17.83k
Expenditure - Governance £51.07k £45.91k £50.90k £47.51k £46.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0