Financial history ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF ST JOSEPH'S, DOVERCOURT

Charity number: 1102272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.64k £4.90k £3.20k £247 £5.05k
Total expenditure £6.51k £4.11k £4.48k £2.42k £4.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A