PALLANT HOUSE GALLERY

Charity number: 1102435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.10m £2.06m £1.98m £3.58m £2.99m
Total expenditure £2.14m £2.15m £2.05m £2.09m £2.22m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £233.50k £145.00k £130.00k £130.00k £130.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.08m £1.13m £1.01m £2.27m £1.73m
Income - Other trading activities £78.20k £70.18k £55.77k £342.38k £37.62k
Income - Charitable activities £428.81k £378.28k £399.67k £397.28k £636.78k
Income - Endowments £738.31k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £519.09k £525.00k £512.70k £564.34k £593.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £35.42k £11.31k £12.05k £10.00k £5.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.03m £2.14m £2.02m £2.04m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.65k £34.82k £32.15k £50.73k £95.98k
Expenditure - Governance £11.11k £11.47k £12.66k £11.13k £52.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0