PALLANT HOUSE GALLERY

Charity number: 1102435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JACQUELINE RUSSELL Trustee 22 January 2013 None on record
Clare Margaret Mary Apel Trustee 07 June 2019
CHICHESTER MARKS HOLOCAUST MEMORIAL DAY CIO Received: On time
Abubakar Akinola Abiola Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
ADRIAN SPENCER CLARK Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
Zachary Roger Leonard Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
The Rt Hon the Lord Tyrie of Chichester Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record
Charles David Zelenka Martin Trustee 09 December 2016
THE VISITORS' ART FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE EMBLETON TRUST Received: On time
Harold Roger Wallis Mavity Trustee 23 September 2016 None on record
Elizabeth Davis Trustee 31 December 2017 None on record
JOHN DAVID SEBASTIAN BOOTH Chair 08 January 2014
THE SOCIETY OF ST STEPHEN'S HOUSE Received: 13 days late
PARISH ESTATES CHARITY Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE JOHN BOOTH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
ASCOT PRIORY Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN CHURCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE WALSINGHAM COLLEGE TRUST ASSOCIATION LTD Received: On time
THE CHANTRY BOOK Received: On time
THE CHICHESTER DIOCESAN FUND AND BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
LADY ELIZABETH HATTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
Ruth Susan Butler Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
Andrea Rose Trustee 19 September 2014 None on record
Jane Weeks Trustee 13 June 2014 None on record
Mahtab Hussain Trustee 26 March 2021 None on record