Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS, HARLOW

Charity number: 1102502
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/09/2016 25/09/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.05k £7.53k £6.06k £7.77k £338
Total expenditure £9.07k £2.86k £1.84k £6.19k £922
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A