Trustees BRITISH YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE

Charity number: 1103076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Mark Millson Chair 09 November 2019
KALEIDOSCOPE DIVERSITY TRUST
Received: 22 days late
OMNIBUS - CLAPHAM
Received: On time
Roger Jones Trustee 05 March 2019
MY TIME FOR YOUNG CARERS
Received: On time
Aniela Shuckburgh Trustee 10 July 2018
MAGIC BREAKFAST
Received: On time
Rebecca Jordan Treanor Trustee 10 July 2018
None on record
James Jewell Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record
ALASTAIR ROBERTS Trustee 10 March 2015
None on record
PHILIP MATTHEW SIDDLE Trustee 11 February 2013
None on record
ROYCE BELL Trustee
None on record