Trustees WORCESTER YMCA

Charity number: 1102766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James Simpson Chair 22 September 2014
WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
WORCESTER PASSION PLAY LTD
Received: On time
Paul Taylor Trustee 22 March 2022
WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
LINDSAY SARTORI Trustee 10 December 2021
DIANA AWARD
Received: On time
JULIET HORNE Trustee 28 December 2017
WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
Simon Robert Hill Trustee 11 November 2016
WORCESTERSHIRE YMCA LIMITED
Received: On time
YOUNG SOLUTIONS WORCESTERSHIRE
Received: On time
Michael Higley Trustee 27 July 2015
CHRISTIAN PRAYER MINISTRIES
Received: On time